Randall, Ian Miles (CPSO#: 86654)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anesthesia
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street, 3EN-460
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: 416-340-4359
Fax: 647-722-8665
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ng Randall Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Randall ( CPSO# 86654 )
Dr. K. Ng ( CPSO# 87646 )

Business Address:
Suite 3EN-464
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-5164

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Suite 475
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IAN MILES RANDALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RANDALL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Aug 2015
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2012