Randall, James Patrick (CPSO#: 59820)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 106
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone: (613) 722-3987
Fax: (613) 722-0902
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Nepean ON  K2H 8P4
Canada
Phone: (613) 721-2000
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James Randall Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 27 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Randall ( CPSO# 59820 )

Business Address:
770 Broadview Avenue
Suite 106
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone Number: (613) 722-3987

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 24 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES PATRICK RANDALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RANDALL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2004 to 31 May 2005
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1989
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Nov 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1998