Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Randhawa, Manjinder Singh (CPSO#: 65732)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Mar 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Whitby Medical Centre
3975 Garden Street
Whitby ON  L1R 3A4
Phone: (905) 430-2400
Fax: (905) 430-1599
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Manjinder S. Randhawa Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 07 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Randhawa ( CPSO# 65732 )

Business Address:
North Whitby Medical Centre
3975 Garden Street North
Whitby ON  L1R 3A4
Phone Number: (905) 430-2400

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MANJINDER SINGH RANDHAWA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RANDHAWA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 1993