Randlett, Mary Jane (CPSO#: 52719)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. J. Randlett Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 13 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: 16076 Lakeside Dr PO Box 565 Long Sault, ON K0C 1P0
Date Received: 30 Apr 2018

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018