Randquist, Charles Max Richard (CPSO#: 87858)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 02 Oct 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Oct 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Karolinska Medico-Kirurgiska Institute, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Nov 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Mar 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Oct 2010