Rangaswamy, Satish (CPSO#: 56911)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Feb 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Urology Associates
Suite 18
450 Westheights Drive
Kitchener ON  N2N 2B9
Phone: (519) 578-1282
Fax: (519) 578-1362
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Rangaswamy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 12 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rangaswamy ( CPSO# 56911 )

Business Address:
Urology Associates
18 - 450 Westheights Drive
Kitchener ON  N2N 2B9
Phone Number: (519) 578-1282

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 15 Sep 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SATISH RANGASWAMY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RANGASWAMY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 1988