Ranger, Adrianna Mary (CPSO#: 66604)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Sep 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dept of Paediatric Neurosurgery
L H S C - Victoria Hospital C H W O
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8107
Fax: (519) 685-8171
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adrianna Ranger Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 01 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Diosy ( CPSO# 69111 )
Dr. A. Ranger ( CPSO# 66604 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Paediatric Neurosurgery
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4G5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8107

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADRIANNA MARY RANGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RANGER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 1999