Rangwala, Sohil (CPSO#: 84468)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Primrose Family Medicine Centre
35 Primrose Ave
Ottawa ON  K1R 0A1
Phone: (613) 230-7788
Fax: (613) 230-7778
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rangwala Fung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 15 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rangwala ( CPSO# 84468 )
Dr. C. Fung ( CPSO# 84465 )

Business Address:
Primrose Family Medicine Centre
35 Primrose Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1R 0A1
Phone Number: (613) 230-7788

Business Address:
St. Patrick Nursing Home
2865 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1V 8N5
Phone Number: (613) 731-4660

Business Address:
Perley and Rideau Veteran's Health
Centre
1750 Russell Road
Ottawa ON  K1G 5Z6
Phone Number: (613) 526-7170

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SOHIL RANGWALA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RANGWALA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2008