Ranken, Kersti Anne (CPSO#: 84339)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
379 Church Street
5th Floor
Markham ON  L6B 0T1
Phone: (905) 201-3416
Fax: (905) 472-9797
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kersti Ranken Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 12 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Ranken ( CPSO# 84339 )

Business Address:
5th Floor
379 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 0T1
Phone Number: (905) 201-3416

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KERSTI ANNE RANKEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RANKEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 21 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 22 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012