Rankin, Kate Helen (CPSO#: 111716)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Apr 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 24 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Monash University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Peter Munk Cardiac Centre
Division of Cardiology
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-4800
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATE HELEN RANKIN may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. RANKIN is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. RANKIN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. RANKIN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. RANKIN shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. RANKIN ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. RANKIN ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2017 to 23 Jun 2017
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 24 Jun 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Apr 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018