Rankin, Linda (CPSO#: 84593)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Apr 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Apr 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Bay Regional Health Center
Department of Family Medicine
50 College Dr, PO Box 2500
North Bay ON  P1B 0A4
Phone: (705) 474-8600 Ext. 4500
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Linda Rankin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 26 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Rankin ( CPSO# 84593 )

Business Address:
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 5A4
Phone Number: (705) 474-8600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Dec 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LINDA RANKIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RANKIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 09 Jul 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 2010