Ranney, Donald Alan (CPSO#: 17270)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom
USA - Tennessee

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 1959
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Jun 1961
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Mar 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jun 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2017