Ranney, Ernest Kenneth (CPSO#: 14411)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 20 Oct 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Oct 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1953

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 16 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 1953
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 1994
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Oct 1999