Ranson, Marilyn Diane Eugene (CPSO#: 60741)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARILYN DIANE EUGENE RANSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RANSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1989