Rao, Anita (CPSO#: 68820)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Credit Valley Site
2200 Eglinton Ave W.
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-2200
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kumar Rao Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 01 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kumar ( CPSO# 69292 )
Dr. A. Rao ( CPSO# 68820 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
Physician's Lounge
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANITA RAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1997