Rao, Geetha (CPSO#: 63921)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: Narayanaswamy, Geetha (used until: 28 May 1992 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
180 Sandalwood Parkway East
Brampton ON  L6Z 1Y4
Phone: (905) 846-9255
Fax: (905) 846-2525
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Geetha Rao Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 29 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Rao ( CPSO# 63921 )

Business Address:
180 Sandalwood Parkway
Brampton ON  L6Z 1Y4
Phone Number: (905) 846-9255

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEETHA RAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1991 to 15 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1992