Rao, Goutham (CPSO#: 67045)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 23 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1995
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Jun 2003