Rao, Kallakurchi Gopinatha (CPSO#: 22967)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 13 Dec 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Dec 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Madras, 1953

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 01 Jan 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jan 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 1977
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 13 Dec 1996