Rao, Nasa Sanjay Kumar (CPSO#: 106121)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:St. John's Medical College, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Ottawa Mental Health Centre
Department of Psychiatry
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone: (613) 722-6521
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N.S. Rao Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 01 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Rao ( CPSO# 106121)

Business Address:
Royal Ottawa Mental Health Centre
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone Number: (613) 722-6521

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nova Scotia
United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 17 May 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NASA SANJAY KUMAR RAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 May 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2017