Rao, Venkat Bheemsen (CPSO#: 22486)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Osmania University, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 7 - 900 King Street West Kitchener ON N2G 1G5
Date Received: 29 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Dec 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018