Rao, Vivek (CPSO#: 65313)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
4N 457
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3562
Fax: (416) 340-3337
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vivek Rao Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 12 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Rao ( CPSO# 65313 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
4N 457 - 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3562

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VIVEK RAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 4 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Resident 5 - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1993