Raphael, Simon Jonathan (CPSO#: 53863)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Nov 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
Department of Laboratory Medicine
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: 4167566517
Fax: 4167564294
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Simon J. Raphael Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 23 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Raphael ( CPSO# 53863 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
Department of Laboratory Medicine
4001 Leslie Street
Room 4SE106
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6517

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 31 May 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SIMON JONATHAN RAPHAEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAPHAEL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 1985 to 14 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - General Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 1985