Rapoport, David (CPSO#: 21356)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 09 Apr 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Apr 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Suite 303 4430 Bathurst Street Toronto ON M3H 3S3
Instructions: Records are with Dr. S.E Parker
Date Received: 07 Apr 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1976 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Apr 2017