Rapoport, Myra Isa (CPSO#: 54174)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Nov 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Midwest Imaging Professionals
c/o Resurrection Medical Center
7435 West Talcott Avenue
Chicago IL  60631
United States
Phone: (773) 792-5199
Fax: (773) 792-5124

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Illinois

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 28 May 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MYRA ISA RAPOPORT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAPOPORT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Nov 1985