Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Rappaport, Henrietta Sophie (CPSO#: 28272)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jun 1976

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 1976

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 216
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
North York ON  M2J 1V1
Phone: (416) 498-8999
Fax: (416) 498-3114
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. Rappaport Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 15 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Burns ( CPSO# 97552 )
Dr. M. Maarse ( CPSO# 93068 )
Dr. H. Rappaport ( CPSO# 28272 )

Business Address:
Suite 216
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
North York ON  M2J 1V1
Phone Number: (416) 498-8999

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1981 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HENRIETTA SOPHIE RAPPAPORT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAPPAPORT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1976