Rapson, Dilys Ann (CPSO#: 27560)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 223 Fairway Hill Cres Kingston, ON K7M 2B5 (Laboratory Physician)
Date Received: 23 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematological Pathology Effective: 20 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017