Rapson, Valerie Elizabeth (CPSO#: 62620)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Nov 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
190 Cundles Road East
Suite 307
Barrie ON  L4M 4S5
Phone: (705) 739-1156
Fax: (705) 739-9013
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VALERIE ELIZABETH RAPSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAPSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 1991