Raptis, Stavros (CPSO#: 61693)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Mar 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Mar 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Greek

Education:McGill University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Montfort hospital
713 Montreal rd
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 854-5763
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STAVROS RAPTIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAPTIS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Nov 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2012