Rashid, Zaihan (CPSO#: 78414)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Aug 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Aug 2002

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
47 Liberty Street S
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4
Phone: (905) 623-3331
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zaihan Rashid Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 31 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Rashid ( CPSO# 78414 )

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health
Bowmanville Hospital
47 Liberty Street
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4
Phone Number: (905) 623-3331

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 11 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ZAIHAN RASHID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RASHID is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2002

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: September 16, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)