Rashidi, Babak (CPSO#: 95954)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa General Campus, Department
of Internal Medicine
Box 209-501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 75354
Fax: (613) 737-8688
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Rd
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Canada
Phone: 613-721-2000
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Babak Rashidi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 28 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Rashidi ( CPSO# 95954 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Internal Medicine
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
General Internal Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BABAK RASHIDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RASHIDI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015