Rashidi, Farid (CPSO#: 82702)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 May 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 May 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
103 Hospital Drive
Room 1574
Saskatoon SK  S7N0W8
Phone: 3066552396
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Farid Rashidi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 10 2012


Corporation Name: Farid Rashidi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 7 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saskatchewan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FARID RASHIDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RASHIDI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 May 2005