Rashidi Naimabadi, Mahmoud (CPSO#: 69711)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:KERMAN UNIVERSITY OF MEDICAL SCIENCES, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 14 Dec 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 15 Dec 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 14 Dec 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 15 Dec 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 14 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 15 Dec 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 14 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 15 Dec 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 14 Dec 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 15 Dec 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2002