Raskin, William Raphael (CPSO#: 101081)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Odette Cancer Centre
2075 Bayview Ave, Toronto, ON M4N3M
Toronto ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM RAPHAEL RASKIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RASKIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017