Rasmusen, Lee Albert (CPSO#: 61365)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Apr 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Apr 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
500 Church St
Penetanguishene ON  L9M 1G3
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LEE ALBERT RASMUSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RASMUSEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2018