Raso, Dean Andrew (CPSO#: 86220)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Oct 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone: (519) 822-5350
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dean A. Raso Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 03 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Raso ( CPSO# 86220 )

Business Address:
Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 822-5350

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 24 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEAN ANDREW RASO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RASO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 09 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 10 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 09 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 2011