Rasool, Wasif Rasool Mahboob (CPSO#: 78923)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 10 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, Urdu

Education:Sultan Qaboos University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Newfoundland and Labrador
Oman

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 May 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 28 Apr 2003 to 06 Jun 2003
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 07 Jun 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Oct 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2004 to 31 Oct 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2005 to 31 Oct 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2009 to 30 Nov 2010
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2010
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 10 Aug 2017