Rasskazoff, Serge (CPSO#: 86048)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 22 Aug 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Aug 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:National Medical University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 31 May 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 05 Apr 2007 to 30 May 2007
Elective Trainee - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 26 Jul 2007 to 22 Aug 2007
Elective Trainee - Neuroradiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 May 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Aug 2007