Rassolian, Monee (CPSO#: 111194)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Nov 2016

Expiry Date:  20 Nov 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 21 Nov 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Park Medical Centre
2355 Keele Street
Toronto ON  M6M 4A2
Phone: (416) 244-4377
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Monee Rassolian Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 23 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Rassolian ( CPSO# 111194)

Business Address:
North Park Medical Centre
2355 Keele Street
North York ON  M6M 4A2
Phone Number: (416) 244-4377

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2016 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Nov 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 20 Nov 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 21 Nov 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Monee  Rassolian  may  practise  family  medicine  at the North Park
                  Medical  Centre in Toronto, Ontario, while under supervision  coordinated
                  by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

            2.    The certificate  of  registration  automatically expires three years from
                  the date of issuance.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews  the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns  regarding  Dr.
                        Rassolian's  knowledge,  skill,  judgment  or  attitude,  does  not
                        provide  the  required reports to the College by the due date or if
                        the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing  to  continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Rassolian's practice.
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is  issued on November 21, 2016, and will expire on or
                  before November 20, 2019, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.