Rastogi, Aroop (CPSO#: 68153)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Dec 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Dec 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health Corporation
Department of Radiology
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

101-95 Bayly St
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Canada
Phone: (905) 428-0444
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

222 king street east, suite 1101
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Canada
Phone: (905) 623-4512
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Taunton Health Centre
1290 Keith Ross Court
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Port Perry Imaging
462 Paxon Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Canada
Phone: 905-985-9727
Fax: 905-985-0479
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rastogi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 09 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rastogi ( CPSO# 68153 )

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Port Perry
451 Paxton Street
P.O. Box 960
Port Perry ON  L9L 1A8

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 433-4305

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Bowmanville
47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4

Business Address:
Durham Radiology Associates Inc.
101-95 Bayly Street
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone Number: (905) 428-0444

Business Address:
Suite 1101
222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone Number: (905) 623-4512

Business Address:
Taunton Imaging Centre
1290 Keith Ross Court
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4


Corporation Name: Levine Myers Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 04 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rastogi ( CPSO# 68153 )
Dr. A. Myers ( CPSO# 61041 )
Dr. V. Massaad ( CPSO# 75329 )
Dr. R. Levine ( CPSO# 78178 )
Dr. G. Lacey ( CPSO# 67159 )
Dr. M. Khan ( CPSO# 81024 )
Dr. N. Isaac ( CPSO# 71092 )
Dr. G. Dotsikas ( CPSO# 66718 )
Dr. G. Donsky ( CPSO# 73822 )
Dr. M. Asch ( CPSO# 52679 )
Dr. W. Wei ( CPSO# 86891 )
Dr. A. Raikhlin ( CPSO# 86803 )
Dr. S. Galante ( CPSO# 98914 )

Business Address:
King Street X-Ray & Ultrasound
1290 Keith Ross Court
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone Number: (905) 721-7702

Business Address:
Bowmanville X-Ray & Ultrasound
1101 - 222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone Number: (905) 623-2727

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Oshawa Site
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Business Address:
Baywood X-Ray & Ultrasound
Baywood Medical Clinic
101 - 95 Bayly Avenue
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone Number: (905) 428-0444

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site Port Perry
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AROOP RASTOGI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RASTOGI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 1999