Rastogi, Hirsch (CPSO#: 21603)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:University of Lucknow, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Hamilton Academy of Medicine Unit 206 1 Young Street Hamilton, Ontario L8N 1T8 Tel: (905) 528-1640
Date Received: 05 Aug 2009

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1966 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 1968
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013