Rastogi, Sanjay (CPSO#: 65156)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 15 Aug 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3603 Highway 7 East
Markham ON  L3R 8W3
Phone: (647) 722-2370
Fax: (416) 367-4301
Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Pennsylvania

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Dec 1994 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1993
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 15 Aug 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 15 Aug 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from August 15, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Sanjay Rastogi in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Rastogi to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")
                                                  of
                                          DR. SANJAY RASTOGI
                                            ("Dr. Rastogi")
                                                  to 
                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")



            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  Narcotic Drugs" means from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under
                  the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19, as amended.
                  
                  "Narcotic Preparations" means from the Narcotic Control Regulations made
                  under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19, as
                  amended.
                  
                  "Controlled Drugs" means from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations
                  under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27, as amended.
                  
                  "Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances" means from the
                  Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the
                  Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19, as amended 
                  
                        (A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the
                        Compendium of Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached hereto
                        as Schedule "A"; and the current regulatory lists are attached
                        hereto as Schedule "B")
                  
                  "All other Monitored Drugs" means as defined under the Narcotics Safety
                  and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22, as amended, as noted in
                  Schedule "C".                                          
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Rastogi, certificate of registration number 65156, am a member of
                  the College.  The College has received information regarding my standard
                  of practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Rastogi, acknowledge that the College initiated an investigation
                  bearing File Number 7214744 (the "Investigation").

            (4)   I, Dr. Rastogi, acknowledge that, if an original copy of this Undertaking
                  as signed by me is accepted by the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports
                  Committee, the College will also deliver a caution in person.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (5)   I, Dr. Rastogi, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective upon the date this Undertaking is approved by the ICR Committee
                  ("Effective Date").

            (6)   I, Dr. Rastogi, shall keep a log of all prescriptions for Narcotic Drugs,
                  Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other
                  Targeted Substances and All other Monitored Drugs, in the form attached
                  as set out in Schedule "D", which will include at least the following
                  information (the "Prescribing Log"):  

                        (i)   the date of the appointment;
                        (ii)  the name of the patient and chart/file number;
                        (iii) the name of the medication prescribed, dose, direction,
                              number of tablets to be dispensed and frequency;
                        (iv)  the clinical indication;
                        (v)   whether the prescription is for a new medication and/or
                              different dose or frequency than currently prescribed to the
                              patient (Y/N); 
                        (vi)  Dr. Rastogi's signature;
                        (vii) the date of the Clinical Supervisor's review (if applicable,
                              as set out below); and
                        (viii)the Clinical Supervisor's signature (if applicable, as set
                              out below).
                  
            (7)   I, Dr. Rastogi, undertake to keep a copy of all prescriptions I write for
                  Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines
                  and Other Targeted Substances and All other Monitored Drugs, in the
                  corresponding patient chart.

            (8)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Rastogi, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), for nine (9) months ("Clinical Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Rastogi, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Schedule "E", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s). The
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP"), attached hereto as
                              Schedule "F";
                  
                        (ii)  Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location
                              approved by the College, once every month for three months
                              and quarterly thereafter;
                  
                              i.    Review at least fifteen (15) of my charts for patients
                                    to whom I have prescribed Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic
                                    Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and
                                    Other Targeted Substances and All other Monitored Drugs
                                    since the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s prior review, or if
                                    there are not 15 patients listed in the Prescribing Log
                                    since the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s prior review, then
                                    the charts of all patients listed in the Prescribing
                                    Log since the Clinical Supervisor's prior review; and
                  
                              ii.   the chart of every patient to whom I have initiated a
                                    new prescription for Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic
                                    Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and
                                    Other Targeted Substances and/or All other Monitored
                                    Drugs since the Clinical Supervisor(s)'s prior review 
                  
                        (iii) Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (iv)  Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        (v)   Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (vi)  Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              month for the first three months and quarterly thereafter, or
                              more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor(s) has concerns
                              about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Rastogi, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the educational
                        needs identified in the IEP, attached hereto as Schedule "F", as
                        well as the areas of concern identified in the reports of the
                        medical and concerns that may arise during the period of Clinical
                        Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Rastogi, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Schedule "E"; to this Undertaking, and to abide by
                        the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Rastogi, undertake to ensure that to this Undertaking is
                        signed and delivered to the College within thirty (30) days of the
                        Effective Date.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Rastogi, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Rastogi, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (8)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Rastogi, acknowledge that if I am required to cease practise
                        as a result of section (8)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (9)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Rastogi, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as
                        Schedule "F", including all of the following professional education
                        (the "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   a program(s) satisfactory to the College in: 
                  
                              1.    medical record keeping; and
                              2.    safe opioid prescribing
                        
                        (ii)  any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor(s).
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Rastogi, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Rastogi, acknowledge that a report or reports may be
                        provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with
                        the Professional Education.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Rastogi, undertake to complete this requirement within six
                        months or, if no satisfactory program is available by that time, by
                        the first possible opportunity thereafter.
                  
            (10)  Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Rastogi, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after
                        the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (8)
                        above and Schedule "F" to this Undertaking, I will submit to a
                        reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment"), with a specific
                        focus upon my prescribing practice,  by an assessor or assessors
                        selected by the College (the "Assessor(s)").  I acknowledge that
                        the Reassessment may include a chart review, direct observation of
                        my care, interviews with colleagues and co-workers, feedback from
                        patients and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Rastogi, undertake to co-operate fully with the
                        Reassessment, conducted under the term of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Rastogi, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor(s) may
                        receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may discuss
                        with the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from the
                        Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that the results of the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the report may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Rastogi, acknowledge that if I am of the view that any of
                        the Assessor(s)'s recommendations are unreasonable, I will have
                        thirty (30) days following my receipt of the recommendations within
                        which to provide the College with my submissions in this regard.  I
                        further acknowledge that thereafter, the ICR Committee will
                        consider my submissions and make a determination regarding whether
                        or not the recommendations, or any of them, are reasonable and if
                        so, whether they, or any of them, constitute limitations or
                        restrictions on my practice, and that decision will be provided to
                        me. 
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Rastogi, undertake that, following the decision referenced
                        in section (10)(d) above, I will abide by those recommendations of
                        the Assessor(s) that the ICR Committee has determined are
                        reasonable. 
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Rastogi, hereby consent to the following being included on
                        the public register as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                        certificate of registration, for the purposes of section 23 of the
                        Code: 
                  
                        (i)   any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which the ICR
                              Committee has identified in its decision referenced in
                              section (10)(d) as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                              practice.
                  
            (11)  Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Rastogi, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five
                        (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further
                        undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Rastogi, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s) and
                        patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Rastogi, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS and/or any person who or
                        institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                        College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Rastogi, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent form(s), attached hereto as Schedule "F"; and Schedule
                        "G";, respectively. 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (12)  I, Dr. Rastogi, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (13)  I, Dr. Rastogi, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (14)  I, Dr. Rastogi, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (15)  I, Dr. Rastogi, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (16)  I, Dr. Rastogi, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (17)  I, Dr. Rastogi, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 
            (18)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Rastogi, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Rastogi, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (18)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                        A College investigation was conducted into Dr. Rastogi's family
                        practice, with a specific focus upon prescribing. As a result of
                        the investigation:
                  
                        "Dr. Rastogi will practice under the guidance of a Clinical
                        Supervisor acceptable to the College for 9 months. 
                  
                        "Dr. Rastogi will engage in professional education in prescribing
                        and medical record keeping.
                  
                        "Dr. Rastogi's practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected
                        by the College within 6 months of the end of the period of Clinical
                        Supervision.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (19)  I, Dr. Rastogi, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and
                  to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (20)  I, Dr. Rastogi, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (21)  I, Dr. Rastogi, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate
                  my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Clinical
                  Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College,
                  and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Schedule "F" to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  (e)   which comes to their attention in the course of providing the
                        Professional Education and which they reasonably believes indicates
                        a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: August 15, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Sanjay Rastogi to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective August 15, 2017:

A College investigation was conducted into Dr. Rastogi’s family practice, with a specific focus upon prescribing. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Rastogi will practice under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 9 months.

Dr. Rastogi will engage in professional education in prescribing and medical record keeping.

Dr. Rastogi’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.