Rasul, Zahara (CPSO#: 81551)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English

Education:University of Chittagong, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2nd Floor
34 Civic Avenue
Stouffville ON  L4A 1H2
Phone: (905) 640-3100
Fax: (905) 640-5346
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zahara Rasul Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 22 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Rasul ( CPSO# 81551 )

Business Address:
34 Civic Avenue
2nd Floor
Stouffville ON  L4A 1H2
Phone Number: (905) 640-3100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ZAHARA RASUL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RASUL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006