Rathbone, Michel Piers (CPSO#: 51469)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Liverpool, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University Juravinski Hosp
Department of Medicine
Division of Neurology
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 574-8630
Fax: (905) 383-3958
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Canada
Phone: (905) 574-8630
Fax: (289) 639-2867
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Haldimand War Memorial Hospital
206 John St
Dunnville
Dunnville ON  N1A 2P7
Canada
Phone: (905) 774-7431
County: Regional Municipality of Haldimand-Norfolk
Electoral District: 04

Regional Rehabilitation Centre
Hamilton Health Sciences
300 Wellington Street North
Hamilton
Hamilton ON  L8L 8E7
Canada
Phone: 905-521-2100
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton St E
Hamilton
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Canada
Phone: 905-521-2100
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

201 James Street South
Hamilton
Hamilton ON  L8P 3A8
Canada
Phone: 905-574-8630
Fax: 905-383-3958
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michel Rathbone Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 15 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Rathbone ( CPSO# 51469 )

Business Address:
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 574-8630

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital Dunnville
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 28 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHEL PIERS RATHBONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RATHBONE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 2 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 3 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 4 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1999