Rathee, Seema Rani (CPSO#: 62668)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Dalhousie University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2533 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 1L1
Phone: (416) 698-5521
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

312 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 1A5
Canada
Phone: (905) 889-2005
Fax: (905) 889-2006
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

13291 Yonge Street
Suite 401
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Canada
Phone: 905-773-1599
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Seema Rathee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 09 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rathee ( CPSO# 62668 )

Business Address:
2533 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 1L1
Phone Number: (416) 698-5521

Business Address:
312 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 1A5
Phone Number: (905) 889-2005

Business Address:
Suite 401
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Phone Number: (905) 773-1599

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SEEMA RANI RATHEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RATHEE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1991