Rathwell, Jonathan Michael (CPSO#: 82813)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rideau Crossing Family
Health Centre
90 Royal Landing Gate
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Phone: (613) 258-0100
Fax: (613) 258-6171
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jonathan Rathwell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 05 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rathwell ( CPSO# 82813 )

Business Address:
90 Royal Landing Gate
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Phone Number: (613) 258-0100

Business Address:
Kemptville District Hospital
2675 Concession Road
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Phone Number: (613) 258-6133

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JONATHAN MICHAEL RATHWELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RATHWELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2007