Ratnanather, Kingsley Vincent Jeyam (CPSO#: 24871)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Apr 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Apr 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:University of Ceylon, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Apartment 112 1750 Lawrence Avenue West Toronto, ON M6L 3C4
Instructions: Please contact Dr. Ratnanather at 416-245-2538 or write to him to request medical record information.
Date Received: 06 Mar 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Apr 2015

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: April 24, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Kingsley Vincent Ratnanather has resigned from the College.