Rattes, Max Francisco (CPSO#: 52302)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese, Spanish

Education:Universidade Federal de Minas Gerais, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 9214 Pine Island Court Tampa Florida 33647 United States
Date Received: 27 Apr 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Florida

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 07 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 23 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Dec 1992
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016