Rau, Jill Camille (CPSO#: 93438)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Owen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 24 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Owen ( CPSO# 87593 )
Dr. J. Rau ( CPSO# 93438 )

Business Address:
LHSC South Street Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 667-6503

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 15 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 21 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 22 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 21 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 22 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 21 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 22 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 21 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 22 Dec 2015 to 04 Mar 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 05 Mar 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 21 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 22 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Jan 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 09 Jan 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017