Rauh, Michael John (CPSO#: 87025)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queen's University
Richardson Laboratory
Dept of Pathology & Molecular Med
88 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone: (613) 533-2820
Fax: (613) 533-2907
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael J. Rauh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 24 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Rauh ( CPSO# 87025 )

Business Address:
Queen's University
Richardson Laboratory
Dept of Pathology & Molecular Medicine
88 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone Number: (613) 533-2818

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Great War Memorial Site-Perth Perth
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematological Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL JOHN RAUH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAUH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Hematological Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Hematological Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Hematological Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematological Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011