Rauw, Jennifer Marie (CPSO#: 89005)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alberta, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 29 May 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 30 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Mar 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2012 to 31 Mar 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2014